Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Housing and Community Development, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0486/CH0511)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0228
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 /CH0229
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0222)
Title
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078
Title
Task Force on Homeownership Strategy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 (HB0728)
Title
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0511 (HB0450)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0431 Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0450 (SB0486/CH0511) Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0451 /CH0228 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 /CH0229 Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0728 (SB0222) Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1021 Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1078 Task Force on Homeownership Strategy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0222 (HB0728) Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 /CH0511 (HB0450) Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act) Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM