Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Housing and Community Development, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0075
Title
Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0239 (SB0262)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335
Title
Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0480)
Title
Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058
Title
Housing and Community Development - Notice of Proposed Projects
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0323/CH0239)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0420)
Title
Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0066 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0182 /CH0075 Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 /CH0239 (SB0262) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes Delegate Impallaria 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 (SB0480) Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1210 Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of Modifications Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 Housing and Community Development - Notice of Proposed Projects Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0323/CH0239) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes Senator Jennings 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 (HB0420) Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM