Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Howard County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0614)
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
County Boards of Education - Payment Data - Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1509
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 32-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Rental Subsidy Under the Howard County "Live Where You Work" Program Ho. Co. 20-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Areas Ho. Co. 01–20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521
Title
Howard County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Notice of School District Boundary Changes Ho. Co. 04-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 (HB0310)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB0203)
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0203 (SB0614) Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0826 Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1092 County Boards of Education - Payment Data - Disclosures Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1454 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1509 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 32-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Rental Subsidy Under the Howard County "Live Where You Work" Program Ho. Co. 20-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1511 Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Areas Ho. Co. 01–20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 Howard County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Notice of School District Boundary Changes Ho. Co. 04-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1544 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0184 (HB0310) University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0614 (HB0203) Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0962 Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1081 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 1:13 PM