Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Rights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0636
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933 /CH0653
Title
Crimes - Human Trafficking of Minor - Defense of Ignorance of Victim's Age
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0215)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 (HB1188)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654
Title
Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0713 /CH0636 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0933 /CH0653 Crimes - Human Trafficking of Minor - Defense of Ignorance of Victim's Age Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 (SB0215) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 (HB1188) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0654 Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013 Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM