Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Rights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0270)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB1018)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB0819)
Title
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0001/JR0003)
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0358)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB0608)
Title
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB0577)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0003 (HJ0002)
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0358 (SB0270) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0577 (SB1018) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0608 (SB0819) Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0696 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 (SJ0001/JR0003) Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0078 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0358) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 (HB0608) Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB0577) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0001 /JR0003 (HJ0002) Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution Senator Frosh 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SJ0002 Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 Human Trafficking Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM