Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Human Rights -see also- Human Trafficking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011
Title
Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0151)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130
Title
Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0162)
Title
Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353
Title
Civil Actions - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448
Title
State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Freedom Day
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533
Title
State Government – Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 (SB0317)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Right to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Coordinator
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997
Title
Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118
Title
Health Care Facilities – Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0082)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB0308)
Title
Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 (HB0750)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Right to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Coordinator
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0050 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0082 (SB0151) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0130 Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0308 (SB0162) Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0353 Civil Actions - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0448 State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Freedom Day Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0498 First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0533 State Government – Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0750 (SB0317) Office of the Attorney General - Right to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Coordinator Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0753 Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0997 Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1037 Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1118 Health Care Facilities – Discrimination Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1167 Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1314 Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0151 (HB0082) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0162 (HB0308) Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 (HB0750) Office of the Attorney General - Right to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Coordinator Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0587 Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0930 Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0007 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/2/2021 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page