Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Resources, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0090
Title
Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 /CH0367
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on Payouts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086 (SB0576)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0388)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137 (SB0898)
Title
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB1125)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB1086)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802
Title
Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 (HB0955/CH0394)
Title
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1137)
Title
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0245 /CH0090 Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0333 /CH0367 Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0662 Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on Payouts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0834 Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1086 (SB0576) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1125 (SB0388) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 (SB0898) Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1518 Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0071 Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0388 (HB1125) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB1086) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 (HB0955/CH0394) Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services Senator Garagiola 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0898 (HB1137) Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM