Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Resources, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0812)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 /CH0419
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0553 (SB0763/CH0552)
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907 /CH0622
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0796/CH0341)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0210)
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174 /CH0448
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0914)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 (SB0685/CH0190)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 /CH0451
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525
Title
State Government - Commission on Efficiency in State Government - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB1053)
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0190 (HB1284)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0552 (HB0805/CH0553)
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 /CH0341 (HB1036)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0550)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1270)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1093
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1105
Title
Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0550 (SB0812) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 /CH0419 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents Delegate Murphy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 /CH0553 (SB0763/CH0552) Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0907 /CH0622 Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support Payments Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB0796/CH0341) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1053 (SB0210) Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task Force Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 /CH0448 Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0914) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 (SB0685/CH0190) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners Delegate Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1307 /CH0451 Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1525 State Government - Commission on Efficiency in State Government - Establishment Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0210 (HB1053) Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task Force Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0190 (HB1284) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0552 (HB0805/CH0553) Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0796 /CH0341 (HB1036) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB0550) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 (HB1270) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1093 State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1105 Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM