Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Resources, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0245
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Centralized Confidential Database
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0422
Title
Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0524)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0460
Title
Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and Models
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0571)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Voter Registration Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0832)
Title
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0575)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0856)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1196)
Title
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0199 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0245 Child Abuse and Neglect - Centralized Confidential Database Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0460 /CH0422 Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0524) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0852 /CH0460 Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and Models Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 (SB0571) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1030 2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1049 Voter Registration Act of 2015 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0832) Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0575) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0856) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0832 (HB1196) Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM