Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Trafficking -see also- Prostitution; Crimes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 (SB0146/CH0233)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234 (SB0162)
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734 /CH0023 (SB0689/CH0024)
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0559 (SB0688)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971 (SB0605)
Title
Hospitals - Emergency Departments - Identification, Treatment, and Rescue of Human Trafficking Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Felony
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 /CH0373
Title
Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0233 (HB0005)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB0234)
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 (HB0971)
Title
Hospitals - Emergency Departments - Identification, Treatment, and Rescue of Human Trafficking Victims
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0827/CH0559)
Title
Juvenile Law – Sex Trafficking – Immunity, Services, and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0024 (HB0734/CH0023)
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 (SB0146/CH0233) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0234 (SB0162) Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0734 /CH0023 (SB0689/CH0024) Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0827 /CH0559 (SB0688) Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0971 (SB0605) Hospitals - Emergency Departments - Identification, Treatment, and Rescue of Human Trafficking Victims Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB1039 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1084 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Felony Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1198 /CH0373 Human Trafficking – Required Posting Delegate Cox 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0146 /CH0233 (HB0005) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0162 (HB0234) Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 (HB0971) Hospitals - Emergency Departments - Identification, Treatment, and Rescue of Human Trafficking Victims Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB0827/CH0559) Juvenile Law – Sex Trafficking – Immunity, Services, and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0689 /CH0024 (HB0734/CH0023) Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM