Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Human Trafficking -see also- Prostitution; Crimes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0001/JR0001)
Title
2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0001 (HJ0007)
Title
2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 126
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0382 Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0575 Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1245 Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0007 (SJ0001/JR0001) 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0742 Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0001 /JR0001 (HJ0007) 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights Senator McCray 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/14/2020 3:52 PM