Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Human Trafficking -see also- Prostitution; Crimes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0484)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0876)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109
Title
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0193)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB0338)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0138 Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0193 (SB0484) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0338 (SB0876) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0109 Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
SB0484 (HB0193) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB0338) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page