Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hunting -see also- Trapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007 /CH0172 (SB0182/CH0173)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 /CH0110
Title
Calvert County – Hunting – Deer Management Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0123
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636
Title
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0181 (SB0341/CH0180)
Title
Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent Pink
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0959)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 /CH0519
Title
Waterfowl Hunting Guide License - Guide Services for Hunting Snow Geese - Reciprocity
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338 (SB0817)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429
Title
Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440
Title
Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1561
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1699 (SB1166)
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0062
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0173 (HB0007/CH0172)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0180 (HB1118/CH0181)
Title
Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent Pink
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0644
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB1338)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB1122)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1166 (HB1699)
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 /CH0172 (SB0182/CH0173) Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0091 Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
HB0119 /CH0110 Calvert County – Hunting – Deer Management Permits Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 /CH0123 Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0636 Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1118 /CH0181 (SB0341/CH0180) Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent Pink Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1122 (SB0959) Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1163 /CH0519 Waterfowl Hunting Guide License - Guide Services for Hunting Snow Geese - Reciprocity Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1338 (SB0817) Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance Fee Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1561 Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear Exception Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1699 (SB1166) Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0062 Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 /CH0173 (HB0007/CH0172) Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0341 /CH0180 (HB1118/CH0181) Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent Pink Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0571 /CH0644 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB1338) Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 (HB1122) Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1166 (HB1699) Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM