Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 (SB0772)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0006)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0340
Title
Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0341
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1314)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1132
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0002)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 (SB0772) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 (SJ0006) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0340 Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0341 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0772 (HB1314) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1132 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0006 (HJ0002) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM