Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006)
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 (SB0748)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0790
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1642 (SB1012)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479)
Title
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB0791)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1642)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006) Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 (SB0748) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0790 Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1642 (SB1012) Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479) Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0748 (HB0791) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1012 (HB1642) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM