Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0090
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 /CH0092
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0791)
Title
State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0825)
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Financial Institutions - Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0786)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0143
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0087
Title
Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 (HB1127)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0431)
Title
State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB0603)
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0090 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0061 /CH0092 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 (SB0791) State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0603 (SB0825) Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0816 Financial Institutions - Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Exemption Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1127 (SB0786) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1216 Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0051 /CH0143 Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 /CH0087 Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices President 6 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0786 (HB1127) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0431) State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0825 (HB0603) Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM