Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 (SB0160)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774 /CH0320 (SB0409/CH0321)
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882
Title
Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 /CH0443 (SB0939/CH0444)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489 (SB0975)
Title
Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0498
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0499
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0274)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0321 (HB0774/CH0320)
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0444 (HB1196/CH0443)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 (HB1489)
Title
Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0274 (SB0160) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0774 /CH0320 (SB0409/CH0321) Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund Delegate Howard 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 /CH0443 (SB0939/CH0444) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1403 Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 (SB0975) Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0014 /CH0498 Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0499 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0160 (HB0274) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 /CH0321 (HB0774/CH0320) Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 321
Finance
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0621 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 /CH0444 (HB1196/CH0443) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0975 (HB1489) Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:41 PM