Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0328
Title
Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0185)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0471)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0102
Title
Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933
Title
Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0328 Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0471 (SB0185) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1004 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1213 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 (HB0471) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0238 Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0281 /CH0102 Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page