Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0825)
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0873)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 /CH0088
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB0603)
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0746)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0603 (SB0825) Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0746 (SB0873) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Delegate Howard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0068 /CH0088 Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0825 (HB0603) Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0873 (HB0746) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM