Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Consumer Protection - Recurring Automatic Orders - Notice of Method of Contract Cancellation
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 /CH0094 (SB0929/CH0093)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 (SB0552)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 (SB0893)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0965)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647
Title
Consumer Protection - Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 /CH0086
Title
Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 (HB1166)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1200
Title
Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Consumer Protection - Recurring Automatic Orders - Notice of Method of Contract Cancellation Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 /CH0094 (SB0929/CH0093) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 (SB0552) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1058 Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Delegate Frick 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1166 (SB0893) Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0470 Consumer Protection - Scanning Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0552 (HB0965) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0647 Consumer Protection - Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 /CH0086 Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0893 (HB1166) Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0950 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1200 Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Referred Economic Matters
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM