Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 (SB0837)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648
Title
Maryland Consumers' Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0022)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 /CH0676 (SB0202/CH0677)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0480
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937
Title
Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0515
Title
Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Schedule I Controlled Dangerous Substances - Advertisement - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts Renewal - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0794
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1584
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1654
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1655
Title
Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0673)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0677 (HB0710/CH0676)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 /CH0826 (HB0740/CH0825)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB0635)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0635 (SB0837) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0648 Maryland Consumers' Rights Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0673 (SB0022) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0710 /CH0676 (SB0202/CH0677) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 /CH0480 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0937 Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 /CH0515 Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018 Delegate Afzali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call Center Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Schedule I Controlled Dangerous Substances - Advertisement - Prohibited Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts Renewal - Restrictions Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 /CH0794 Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1584 Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Reassigned to Finance
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1654 Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1655 Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality Protections Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 (HB0673) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0202 /CH0677 (HB0710/CH0676) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0693 /CH0826 (HB0740/CH0825) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0837 (HB0635) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM