Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Personal and Business Documents - Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Owner or Operator of Livery Stable - Lien on Dairy Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068 (SB0425)
Title
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0408
Title
Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 (HB1068)
Title
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0458 Personal and Business Documents - Evidence Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0502 Owner or Operator of Livery Stable - Lien on Dairy Animal Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1068 (SB0425) Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 /CH0408 Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0425 (HB1068) Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM