Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 (SB0404/CH0058)
Title
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430
Title
Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0522/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB0898)
Title
Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 /CH0058 (HB0099)
Title
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0302 (HB0564)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 /CH0307
Title
Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1158)
Title
Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 (SB0404/CH0058) Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith Delegate Cardin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 (SB0522/CH0302) Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 (SB0898) Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - Restrictions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1435 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0404 /CH0058 (HB0099) Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0522 /CH0302 (HB0564) Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0585 /CH0307 Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0898 (HB1158) Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - Restrictions Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page