Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0789)
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0895)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0841 (SB0858/CH0842)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493
Title
Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Commercial Law - Copyright Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB0412)
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 /CH0842 (HB1415/CH0841)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1180)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0412 (SB0789) Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6 Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 (SB0895) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 /CH0841 (SB0858/CH0842) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers Delegate Anderson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0065 Commercial Law - Copyright Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 (HB0412) Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0858 /CH0842 (HB1415/CH0841) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0895 (HB1180) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM