Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323
Title
Consumer Protection - Cellular Telephones - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487
Title
Workgroup to Study Adopting the Uniform Voidable Transactions Act
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544 /CH0847 (SB0891/CH0848)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1614 /CH0344
Title
Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 /CH0848 (HB1544/CH0847)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1323 Consumer Protection - Cellular Telephones - Disclosure Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1487 Workgroup to Study Adopting the Uniform Voidable Transactions Act Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1544 /CH0847 (SB0891/CH0848) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1614 /CH0344 Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Economic Matters
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 /CH0848 (HB1544/CH0847) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM