Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0791)
Title
State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0284 (SB0695)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 (SB0255)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities - Late Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB1302)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB1065/CH0284)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0431)
Title
State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0431 (SB0791) State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 /CH0284 (SB0695) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1302 (SB0255) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
HB1380 Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities - Late Fees Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0255 (HB1302) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 (HB1065/CH0284) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0791 (HB0431) State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM