Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0446/CH0554)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Disorderly School Closures
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 /CH0433
Title
Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0554 (HB0469)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0469 (SB0446/CH0554) Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Disorderly School Closures Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1142 /CH0433 Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0446 /CH0554 (HB0469) Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:12 PM