Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0512)
Title
Commercial Law - Professional Athlete Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Retail Pricing – Required Disclosure and Manner of Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0596)
Title
Commercial Law – Professional Athlete Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0340 Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0596 (SB0512) Commercial Law - Professional Athlete Funding Act Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1274 Retail Pricing – Required Disclosure and Manner of Disclosure Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 (HB0596) Commercial Law – Professional Athlete Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page