Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Nonresidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882
Title
Maryland Workers Fairness Act
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891
Title
Voting Disclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 /CH0300
Title
State Racing Commission - Employees of Licensees - Repeal of Citizenship Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0373
Title
Education - English Language Learner Liaison Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0659 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 Maryland Workers Fairness Act Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0891 Voting Disclosure Act of 2015 Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 /CH0300 State Racing Commission - Employees of Licensees - Repeal of Citizenship Requirement Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 /CH0373 Education - English Language Learner Liaison Pilot Program Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM