Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Nonresidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0537 (SB0178/CH0536)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 (SB0209)
Title
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 (SB0470)
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0153)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950
Title
Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
Lawyers - Admission to the Bar - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122
Title
Voting Disclosure Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 (SB0664)
Title
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Release - Notification of Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298
Title
Baltimore County - Release From Local Correctional Facilities - Notification of Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 /CH0151
Title
State Government - Web Sites - Language Access
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0346
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Adult Education and Literacy Services - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0732)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0536 (HB0493/CH0537)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0634)
Title
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0678)
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1175)
Title
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0493 /CH0537 (SB0178/CH0536) Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0634 (SB0209) Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0678 (SB0470) Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds Delegate Branch 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0732 (SB0153) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0950 Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - Disclosure Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 Lawyers - Admission to the Bar - Qualifications Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1122 Voting Disclosure Act of 2016 Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1175 (SB0664) Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 State and Local Correctional Facilities - Release - Notification of Immigration Status Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 Baltimore County - Release From Local Correctional Facilities - Notification of Immigration Status Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 /CH0151 State Government - Web Sites - Language Access Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0346 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Adult Education and Literacy Services - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0153 (HB0732) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0536 (HB0493/CH0537) Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0634) Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB0678) Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly)
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1175) Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM