Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Residency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 /CH0422 (SB0144/CH0421)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0742)
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 /CH0489 (SB0853/CH0490)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 (SB0661/CH0529)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Undocumented Immigrants - Transfer to United States Department of Homeland Security (Keep Our Communities Safe Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0953)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 (SB0817)
Title
Correctional Facilities and Police Officers – Procedures – Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0718)
Title
State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0599)
Title
Immigration Enforcement – Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses – Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0421 (HB0214/CH0422)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0529 (HB0733)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB1165)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 (HB0224)
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0403
Title
Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0424 (HB0814/CH0423)
Title
Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0913)
Title
Correctional Facilities and Police Officers - Procedures - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0490 (HB0433/CH0489)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB0856)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0214 /CH0422 (SB0144/CH0421) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0224 (SB0742) State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0433 /CH0489 (SB0853/CH0490) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0733 (SB0661/CH0529) Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 State and Local Correctional Facilities - Undocumented Immigrants - Transfer to United States Department of Homeland Security (Keep Our Communities Safe Act of 2019) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 (SB0953) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB0913 (SB0817) Correctional Facilities and Police Officers – Procedures – Immigration Status Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 (SB0718) State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1273 (SB0599) Immigration Enforcement – Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses – Policies Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0144 /CH0421 (HB0214/CH0422) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0661 /CH0529 (HB0733) Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0718 (HB1165) Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0742 (HB0224) State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0403 Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0424 (HB0814/CH0423) Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB0913) Correctional Facilities and Police Officers - Procedures - Immigration Status Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0490 (HB0433/CH0489) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 (HB0856) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM