Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 /CH0447 (SB0346)
Title
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Public Health - Religious Exemptions from Immunization Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB0657/CH0447)
Title
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0598
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0657 /CH0447 (SB0346) Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0687 Public Health - Religious Exemptions from Immunization Requirements - Repeal Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0346 (HB0657/CH0447) Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0597 Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0598 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM