Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0366)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262 (SB1168)
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481
Title
Public Health - Immunizations of Adolescents - Recommendations
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0432)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1168 (HB1262)
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0432 (SB0366) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 (SB1168) Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 Public Health - Immunizations of Adolescents - Recommendations Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0432) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1168 (HB1262) Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM