Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 (SB0135)
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530 (SB0355)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0777)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 /CH0620 (SB0872/CH0621)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1663 /CH0014 (SB1080/CH0013)
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0087)
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0530)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB0779)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0621 (HB0959/CH0620)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 /CH0013 (HB1663/CH0014)
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0087 (SB0135) Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 (SB0355) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 (SB0777) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 /CH0620 (SB0872/CH0621) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1663 /CH0014 (SB1080/CH0013) State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020) Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0135 (HB0087) Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0355 (HB0530) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0777 (HB0779) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 /CH0621 (HB0959/CH0620) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
SB1080 /CH0013 (HB1663/CH0014) State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020) President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:50 PM