Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Independent Contractors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0641)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Classification of Employees and Independent Contractors - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450
Title
Education - Food Waste Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0647 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0799 Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0641) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1448 Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Classification of Employees and Independent Contractors - Guidelines Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1450 Education - Food Waste Grant Program - Established Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0641 (HB1097) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 6:31 PM