Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Indictments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0683)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0185)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0683) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0185) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM