Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Indigent Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 (SB0147)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 /CH0776
Title
Prince George's County - Affordable Housing Commission PG 408-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0379 (SB0308/CH0380)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612 (SB0272)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence Project
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0842/CH0389)
Title
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955 /CH0105
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Crisis Shelter Home Program for the Homeless
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB1218/CH0748)
Title
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1667
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1768
Title
Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1789
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Loving Arms Homeless Youth Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1797
Title
Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Light House Homeless Prevention Support Center
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0094)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0612)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence Project
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0621
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB0556/CH0233)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 /CH0389 (HB0781/CH0388)
Title
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0559 (HB1685/CH0558)
Title
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975
Title
Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1218 /CH0748 (HB1224)
Title
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 (SB0147) Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB0236 /CH0776 Prince George's County - Affordable Housing Commission PG 408-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0379 (SB0308/CH0380) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - Reports Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 (SB0272) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence Project Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0842/CH0389) Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination Delegate Mosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0955 /CH0105 Department of Housing and Community Development - Crisis Shelter Home Program for the Homeless Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 (SB1218/CH0748) Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1667 Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1768 Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - Procedures Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1789 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Loving Arms Homeless Youth Facility Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1797 Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0025 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Light House Homeless Prevention Support Center Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0147 (HB0094) Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0272 (HB0612) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence Project Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0621 Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0466 (HB0556/CH0233) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 /CH0389 (HB0781/CH0388) Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 /CH0559 (HB1685/CH0558) Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund) Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1218 /CH0748 (HB1224) Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018 Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Finance
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM