Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Indigent Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002
Title
Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 (SB0932)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 /CH0248 (SB0810/CH0249)
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 (SB0661/CH0529)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 /CH0553 (SB0930)
Title
Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0529 (HB0733)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 /CH0249 (HB0672/CH0248)
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB0911/CH0553)
Title
Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0502 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0566 (SB0932) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 /CH0248 (SB0810/CH0249) Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0733 (SB0661/CH0529) Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 /CH0553 (SB0930) Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1032 Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0661 /CH0529 (HB0733) Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 /CH0249 (HB0672/CH0248) Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0930 (HB0911/CH0553) Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors Senator Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0932 (HB0566) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
SB1017 Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM