Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Information Technology, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0503 (SB0446/CH0502)
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 (SB0484)
Title
Procurement - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 (SB0197)
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260 (SB0644/CH0069)
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
State Government - Functionality and Security of Web Sites - Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197 (HB0804)
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0502 (HB0396/CH0503)
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0632)
Title
Procurement - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 /CH0069 (HB1260)
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 /CH0503 (SB0446/CH0502) Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0632 (SB0484) Procurement - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Revisions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 (SB0197) Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1260 (SB0644/CH0069) State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data Delegate Barve 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1306 State Government - Functionality and Security of Web Sites - Certification Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0197 (HB0804) Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0446 /CH0502 (HB0396/CH0503) Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 (HB0632) Procurement - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Revisions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 /CH0069 (HB1260) State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM