Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Information Technology, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0287
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Telecommunications Access of Maryland Program - Communications Companies - Registration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 /CH0151
Title
State Government - Web Sites - Language Access
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 /CH0287 Freedom to Vote Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 Telecommunications Access of Maryland Program - Communications Companies - Registration Requirement Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0028 /CH0151 State Government - Web Sites - Language Access Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM