Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Information Technology, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248)
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0590
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 (SB0439)
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 (SB1025)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0601/CH0673)
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1140)
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1025 (HB1525)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248) Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0590 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 (SB0439) State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1525 (SB1025) Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0248 (HB0601/CH0673) Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0286 Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 (HB1140) State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1025 (HB1525) Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708) State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM