Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Information Technology, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0180)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 /CH0381
Title
Education - Student Data Governance
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 /CH0176
Title
Rural Broadband Communication Services
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 /CH0631
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 /CH0524
Title
Election Law - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 /CH0733
Title
State Government - Websites - Language Access
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 (HB0269)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 /CH0632
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482
Title
Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0467
Title
State Government - Security Training - Protection of Security-Sensitive Data
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882
Title
Procurement - Telecommunication and Computer Network Access - Security Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0269 (SB0180) Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0568 /CH0381 Education - Student Data Governance Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 /CH0176 Rural Broadband Communication Services Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 /CH0631 State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1206 Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - Establishment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 /CH0524 Election Law - Cybersecurity Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 /CH0733 State Government - Websites - Language Access Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0180 (HB0269) Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0286 /CH0632 State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0553 /CH0467 State Government - Security Training - Protection of Security-Sensitive Data Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 Procurement - Telecommunication and Computer Network Access - Security Requirements Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM