Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Information Technology, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0184/CH0486)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0486 (HB0071)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679
Title
State Government - Secretary of Information Technology - General Charge of Information Technology Services
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0071 (SB0184/CH0486) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0716 State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 /CH0486 (HB0071) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 State Government - Secretary of Information Technology - General Charge of Information Technology Services Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM