Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insects -see also- Bees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0614
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 /CH0662 (SB0198/CH0661)
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 /CH0585 (SB0876/CH0584)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0661 (HB0211/CH0662)
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 /CH0584 (HB0870/CH0585)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1154
Title
Courts - Limitation on Damages Arising Out of Bedbug Extermination
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1163
Title
Baltimore County - Marinas Infested With Midges - Funding for Larvicide
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0614 State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 /CH0662 (SB0198/CH0661) Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016) Delegate Healey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0870 /CH0585 (SB0876/CH0584) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1102 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 /CH0661 (HB0211/CH0662) Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 /CH0584 (HB0870/CH0585) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1154 Courts - Limitation on Damages Arising Out of Bedbug Extermination Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1163 Baltimore County - Marinas Infested With Midges - Funding for Larvicide Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM