Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0208 (SB0436/CH0207)
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0491
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0494 (SB0414)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0447 (SB0888/CH0446)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 /CH0694 (SB0750/CH0693)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 /CH0729
Title
Civil Actions - Liability of Disability Insurer - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0305 (SB0919)
Title
Insurance - Self-Funded Student Health Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB0896)
Title
Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487 /CH0210 (SB0450/CH0209)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0675/CH0494)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0207 (HB0554/CH0208)
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0693 (HB0919/CH0694)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0425 (HB0900/CH0426)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Personal Injury Protection - Rejection of Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB1300)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0208 (SB0436/CH0207) Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 /CH0491 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0494 (SB0414) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0912 /CH0447 (SB0888/CH0446) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0919 /CH0694 (SB0750/CH0693) Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 /CH0729 Civil Actions - Liability of Disability Insurer - Failure to Act in Good Faith Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1247 /CH0305 (SB0919) Insurance - Self-Funded Student Health Plans Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB0896) Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1487 /CH0210 (SB0450/CH0209) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Economic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0675/CH0494) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0436 /CH0207 (HB0554/CH0208) Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 /CH0693 (HB0919/CH0694) Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0784 /CH0425 (HB0900/CH0426) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Personal Injury Protection - Rejection of Coverage Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0896 (HB1300) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM