Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0066 (SB0189/CH0065)
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0672
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774 /CH0223 (SB0380/CH0224)
Title
Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0571/CH0017)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Workgroup on the Provision and Coverage of Behavioral Health Crisis Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 (SB0533)
Title
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0041
Title
Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 /CH0065 (HB0116/CH0066)
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0514
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 /CH0224 (HB0774/CH0223)
Title
Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB1295)
Title
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0017 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 /CH0066 (SB0189/CH0065) Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 /CH0672 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 /CH0223 (SB0380/CH0224) Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 (SB0571/CH0017) Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1288 Maryland Insurance Administration - Workgroup on the Provision and Coverage of Behavioral Health Crisis Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB1295 (SB0533) Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0041 Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0189 /CH0065 (HB0116/CH0066) Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0289 /CH0514 Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 /CH0224 (HB0774/CH0223) Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 (HB1295) Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 /CH0017 (HB0909) Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM