Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB0227/CH0245)
Title
Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 (SB0482)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 (SB0819)
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmaceutical Manufacturers - Transparency and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989
Title
Health Insurance - Multi-Carrier Common Online Provider Directory Information Systems - Designation and Acceptance of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098 /CH0401
Title
Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 /CH0102
Title
Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 /CH0103
Title
Insurance - Breach of Security of a Computer System - Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0104
Title
Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0105
Title
Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0110
Title
Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance - Membership and Staffing
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050 /CH0111
Title
Health Insurance - Form Filings - Review and Waiting Period Extensions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 /CH0245 (HB0608)
Title
Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0598 (HB0258/CH0597)
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 (HB0846)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 /CH0357 (HB0599/CH0358)
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Insurance - Group Retirement Annuities - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0608 (SB0227/CH0245) Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0846 (SB0482) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 (SB0819) Health Insurance - Pharmaceutical Manufacturers - Transparency and Reporting Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 Health Insurance - Multi-Carrier Common Online Provider Directory Information Systems - Designation and Acceptance of Information Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 /CH0401 Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 /CH0102 Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0030 /CH0103 Insurance - Breach of Security of a Computer System - Notification Requirement Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 /CH0104 Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0105 Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0110 Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance - Membership and Staffing Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0050 /CH0111 Health Insurance - Form Filings - Review and Waiting Period Extensions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0227 /CH0245 (HB0608) Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0239 /CH0598 (HB0258/CH0597) Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 (HB0846) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0631 /CH0357 (HB0599/CH0358) Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Insurance - Group Retirement Annuities - Protections Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM