Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 /CH0438 (SB0047/CH0437)
Title
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured Goods
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0115
Title
Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 (SB0438)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 /CH0282 (SB0501/CH0281)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical Experience
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 /CH0555 (SB0811/CH0554)
Title
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 (SB0723)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002
Title
Ongoing Conflict in the Democratic Republic of the Congo
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0437 (HB0191/CH0438)
Title
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured Goods
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 /CH0010
Title
Unauthorized Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Transcripts, Diplomas, and Grade Reports - Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0534)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 /CH0281 (HB0624/CH0282)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical Experience
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB0973)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0554 (HB0877/CH0555)
Title
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
International Education - Support
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004
Title
Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent Nation
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0191 /CH0438 (SB0047/CH0437) Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured Goods Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0431 /CH0115 Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 (SB0438) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0624 /CH0282 (SB0501/CH0281) State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical Experience Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0877 /CH0555 (SB0811/CH0554) Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0973 (SB0723) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HJ0002 Ongoing Conflict in the Democratic Republic of the Congo Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0437 (HB0191/CH0438) Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured Goods Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 /CH0010 Unauthorized Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Transcripts, Diplomas, and Grade Reports - Penalties Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 (HB0534) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0501 /CH0281 (HB0624/CH0282) State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical Experience Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB0973) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0811 /CH0554 (HB0877/CH0555) Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 International Education - Support Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0004 Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent Nation Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM