Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352
Title
Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Hair Braiders, Cosmetology Assistants, and Microdermabrasion
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 /CH0262
Title
State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0861)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Nonresident Cardholders
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 /CH0118
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0001 (SB0080/CH0002)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124
Title
State Board of Cosmetology - Natural Hair Care Stylist - Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0004)
Title
State Government - Vietnamese Freedom and Heritage Flag
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0003)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0002 (HB1118/CH0001)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0162)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0385
Title
Audiologists and Speech-Language Pathologists - Licensure Exemption - Clinical Training
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0661)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0008)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0003)
Title
State Government - Vietnamese Freedom and Heritage Flag
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0352 Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel Act Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0499 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Hair Braiders, Cosmetology Assistants, and Microdermabrasion Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0587 /CH0262 State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0661 (SB0861) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1001 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1068 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Nonresident Cardholders Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 /CH0118 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1118 /CH0001 (SB0080/CH0002) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1124 State Board of Cosmetology - Natural Hair Care Stylist - Licensure Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0003 (SJ0004) State Government - Vietnamese Freedom and Heritage Flag Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0003) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0002 (HB1118/CH0001) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0611 (HB0162) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0385 Audiologists and Speech-Language Pathologists - Licensure Exemption - Clinical Training Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0661) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0003 (HJ0008) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0003) State Government - Vietnamese Freedom and Heritage Flag Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM