Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0208 (SB0436/CH0207)
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711 (SB0643)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0123
Title
Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570 (SB1119/CH0469)
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0711)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1119 /CH0469 (HB1570)
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0554 /CH0208 (SB0436/CH0207) Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 (SB0643) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 /CH0123 Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel Act Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016 Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1570 (SB1119/CH0469) State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers Delegate Gutierrez 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0643 (HB0711) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1119 /CH0469 (HB1570) State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers Senator Rosapepe 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM